Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Fergus

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Achonry


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1895BornLouisburgh
20 Jun 192024.4Ordained PriestPriest
15 Feb 194751.1AppointedBishop of Achonry, Ireland
4 May 194751.3Ordained BishopBishop of Achonry, Ireland
17 Mar 197680.2RetiredBishop of Achonry, Ireland
24 Mar 198993.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Achonry, Ireland

MicroData Summary for James Fergus:
Bishop James Fergus (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Achonry

  • a priest for 68.7 years
  • a bishop for 41.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 4 Jun 2015