Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Doorley

Deceased

Bishop of Elphin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1868BornRoscommon
23 Jun 189526.5Ordained PriestPriest
16 Mar 192354.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Elphin, Ireland
16 Mar 192354.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sarepta
24 Jun 192354.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sarepta
17 Jul 192657.6SucceededBishop of Elphin, Ireland
21 Jul 192657.6InstalledBishop of Elphin, Ireland
5 Apr 195081.3DiedBishop of Elphin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Edward Doorley:
Bishop Edward Doorley (born , died ) Bishop of Elphin

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015