Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William J. Philbin

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Down and Connor


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1907BornKiltimagh
21 Jun 193124.4Ordained PriestPriest of Achonry, Ireland
22 Dec 195346.9AppointedBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
14 Mar 195447.1Ordained BishopBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
5 Jun 196255.4AppointedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
24 Aug 198275.6RetiredBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
22 Aug 199184.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Down and Connor, Ireland

MicroData Summary for William J. Philbin:
Bishop William J. Philbin (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Down and Connor

  • a priest for 60.2 years
  • a bishop for 37.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1954
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013