Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas McGettrick, S.P.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Abakaliki, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1905Born
22 Jun 193024.5Ordained PriestPriest of Achonry, Ireland
1932²26.0EnteredPriest of St. Patrick’s Society for the Foreign Missions
10 Nov 193933.8AppointedPrefect of Ogoja, Nigeria
1 Jan 195549.0AppointedBishop of Ogoja, Nigeria
22 May 195549.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ogoja, Nigeria
1 Mar 197367.1AppointedBishop of Abakaliki, Nigeria
19 Feb 198377.1RetiredBishop of Abakaliki, Nigeria
17 Dec 198882.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Abakaliki, Nigeria

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas McGettrick (VIAF: 311781617)
Bishop Thomas McGettrick S.P.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Abakaliki

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEmlegh (Ballymote), Ireland
Ordained PriestSt. Patrick's, College, Maynooth

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 33.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 35
  • opd/ente: CB, 22 Jun 2017
  • c1: CB, 23 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Jun 2017