Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Virginio Domingo Bressanelli, S.C.I.

Bishop Emeritus of Neuquén, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1942 Born
29 Sep 196422.4ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
17 Dec 196624.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
24 May 199149.0AppointedSuperior General of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
27 May 200361.0ResignedSuperior General of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
19 Feb 200562.7AppointedBishop of Comodoro Rivadavia, Argentina
13 May 200563.0Ordained BishopBishop of Comodoro Rivadavia, Argentina
10 Feb 201067.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Neuquén, Argentina
8 Nov 201169.5SucceededBishop of Neuquén, Argentina
3 Aug 201775.2RetiredBishop of Neuquén, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Virginio Domingo Bressanelli
Bishop Virginio Domingo Bressanelli S.C.I. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Neuquén

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBerabevú
Ordained Bishopgymnase, Comodoro Rivadavia, Diocese of Comodoro Rivadavia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Neuquén.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2010
  • s: Bollettino, 8 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,885
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Aug 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Aug 2017