Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Roche Evans

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Denver, Colorado, USA

Titular Bishop of Tubyza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1922Born
31 May 194724.6Ordained PriestPriest of Denver, Colorado, USA
24 Feb 196946.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Denver, Colorado, USA
24 Feb 196946.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tubyza
23 Apr 196946.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tubyza
13 Sep 198562.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Denver, Colorado, USA

MicroData Summary for George Roche Evans
Bishop George Roche Evans (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Denver

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDenver, Diocese of Denver, Colorado
Ordained PriestDenver, Archdiocese of Denver, Colorado

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB, 11 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast