Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Ludwig von Erthal

Deceased

Bishop of Würzburg

Bishop of Bamberg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1730BornLohr
24 Mar 176130.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Mar 177948.5SelectedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
12 Apr 177948.5SelectedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
12 Jul 177948.8ConfirmedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
12 Jul 177948.8ConfirmedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
19 Sep 177949.0Ordained BishopBishop of Würzburg, Germany
14 Feb 179564.4DiedBishop of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Ludwig von Erthal
Bishop Franz Ludwig von Erthal (born , died ) Bishop of Würzburg

  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1779, Number 26
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 114, and Page 234

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 15 Feb 2016