Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roger William Gries, O.S.B.

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cleveland, Ohio, USA

Titular Bishop of Praesidium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1937 Born
11 Jul 195720.2ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
16 May 196326.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
3 Apr 200164.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
3 Apr 200164.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Praesidium
7 Jun 200164.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Praesidium
1 Nov 201376.5RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for Roger William Gries
Bishop Roger William Gries O.S.B. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cleveland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCleveland

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cleveland.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,988
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018