Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antun Škvorcevic

Bishop of Požega, Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1947 Born
25 Jun 197225.1Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jul 199750.1AppointedBishop of Požega, Croatia
27 Sep 199750.3Ordained BishopBishop of Požega, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Antun Škvorcevic
Bishop Antun Škvorcevic (born ) Bishop of Požega

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDavor

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Požega.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,152
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast