Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josip Mrzljak

Bishop Emeritus of Varaždin, Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1944 Born
16 Nov 196925.8Ordained PriestPriest of Zagreb, Croatia
29 Dec 199854.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia
29 Dec 199854.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Caltadria
6 Feb 199955.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caltadria
20 Mar 200763.1AppointedBishop of Varaždin, Croatia
1 Aug 201975.5RetiredBishop of Varaždin, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Josip Mrzljak (VIAF: 305601234)
Bishop Josip Mrzljak (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Varaždin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVukovar
Ordained BishopAssumption of Blessed Virgin Mary and St. Stephen I of Hungary, Cathedral, Zagreb, Archdiocese of Zagreb

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Varaždin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Mar 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,470
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Aug 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast