Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Armengol Valenzuela Poblete, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Carlos de Ancud

Titular Archbishop of Gangra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1843BornCoipue
14 Nov 186219.3ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
10 Feb 186824.5Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
8 Mar 186824.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
30 Jun 191066.9AppointedBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
24 Jul 191067.0Ordained BishopBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
23 Jan 191268.5InstalledBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
16 Dec 191673.4ResignedBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
16 Dec 191673.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Gangra
10 Jul 192279.0DiedBishop Emeritus of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile

MicroData Summary for Pedro Armengol Valenzuela Poblete:
Archbishop Pedro Armengol Valenzuela Poblete O. de M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Carlos de Ancud

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015