Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Domenico Cardinal Gamberini

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede

Prefect of the Apostolic Signatura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1760BornImola
29 Feb 182463.3Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 182565.1AppointedBishop of Orvieto, Italy
15 Jan 182665.2Ordained BishopBishop of Orvieto, Italy
15 Dec 182868.1Elevated to Cardinal
21 May 182968.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
13 Apr 183372.4ResignedBishop of Orvieto, Italy
18 Feb 183978.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
22 Dec 184080.1AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
25 Apr 184180.4DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

MicroData Summary for Antonio Domenico Gamberini (VIAF: 72198689)
Antonio Domenico Cardinal Gamberini (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

  • a priest for 17.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.2 years
  • a cardinal for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 383
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1826, Number 1
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Dec 1828

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 13 Jun 2016