Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guido Benedito Beck de Ramberga, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Araucanía, Chile

Titular Bishop of Mastaura in Asia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1885Born
22 Aug 190923.7Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
29 Jun 191024.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
20 Jan 192539.1AppointedPrefect of Araucanía, Chile
28 Mar 192842.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Araucanía, Chile
28 Mar 192842.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Mastaura in Asia
5 Aug 192842.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mastaura in Asia
15 Aug 192842.6InstalledVicar Apostolic of Araucanía, Chile
5 Mar 195872.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Araucanía, Chile

MicroData Summary for Guido Benedito Beck de Ramberga
Bishop Guido Benedito Beck de Ramberga O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Araucanía

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRamberg, Germany

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,225
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 53
  • sole: CB, 9 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Jun 2017