Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Quentin Jennings

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Thunder Bay, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1896Born
17 Dec 192529.2Ordained PriestPriest of Edmonton, Alberta, Canada
22 Mar 194144.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada
22 Mar 194144.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Sala
11 Jun 194144.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sala
22 Feb 194649.3AppointedBishop of Kamloops, British Columbia, Canada
14 May 195255.6AppointedBishop of Fort William, Ontario, Canada
18 Sep 196972.9RetiredBishop of Fort William, Ontario, Canada
18 Sep 196972.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Assidona
23 Nov 197074.1ResignedTitular Bishop of Assidona
22 Oct 198084.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Thunder Bay, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Edward Quentin Jennings
Bishop Edward Quentin Jennings (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Thunder Bay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint John, New Brunswick

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 39.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast