Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Fergus O’Grady, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Prince George, British Columbia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1908BornMacton
29 Jun 193425.9Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
19 Dec 195547.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Prince Rupert, British Columbia, Canada
19 Dec 195547.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Aspendus
7 Mar 195647.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aspendus
13 Jul 196759.0AppointedBishop of Prince George, British Columbia, Canada
9 Jun 198677.9RetiredBishop of Prince George, British Columbia, Canada
3 Mar 199889.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Prince George, British Columbia, Canada

MicroData Summary for John Fergus O’Grady:
Bishop John Fergus O’Grady O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Prince George

  • a priest for 63.7 years
  • a bishop for 42.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 20
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013