Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João de Brito e Vasconcelos

Deceased

Bishop of Angra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1655³BornLamego
14 Apr 169135.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
16 Apr 169135.4Ordained PriestPriest
19 Apr 171660.4SelectedBishop of Angra, Portugal
7 Dec 171661.0ConfirmedBishop of Angra, Portugal
7 Mar 171761.2Ordained BishopBishop of Angra, Portugal
30 Dec 171964.1DiedBishop of Angra, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for João de Brito e Vasconcelos:
Bishop João de Brito e Vasconcelos (born , died ) Bishop of Angra

  • a priest for 28.7 years
  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 87
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,065
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1717, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015