Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Luiz Ferreira Salles, C.SS.R.

Bishop of Pesqueira, Pernambuco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1957 BornItirapina
27 Jan 198528.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
14 Dec 198528.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
1 Feb 200649.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fortaleza, Ceara, Brazil
1 Feb 200649.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Numidia
17 Mar 200649.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Numidia
15 Feb 201255.1AppointedBishop of Pesqueira, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Luiz Ferreira Salles:
Bishop José Luiz Ferreira Salles C.SS.R. (born ) Bishop of Pesqueira

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pesqueira.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Feb 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,091
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Feb 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013