Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Antonin Hůlka

Deceased

Bishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1851BornVelenovy
18 Jul 187524.4Ordained PriestPriest of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
16 Dec 190756.8AppointedBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
6 Jan 190856.9Ordained BishopBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
10 Feb 192069.0DiedBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Josef Antonin Hůlka:
Bishop Josef Antonin Hůlka (born , died ) Bishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 95
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013