Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Nepomuk Weinlich

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc

Titular Bishop of Proconnesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1831BornWorlicka
20 Jul 185322.0Ordained PriestPriest of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
14 Nov 190473.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
14 Nov 190473.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Proconnesus
18 Dec 190473.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Proconnesus
24 Dec 190574.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Jan Nepomuk Weinlich:
Bishop Jan Nepomuk Weinlich (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 312
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013