Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karel Wisnar

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic

Titular Bishop of Callipolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1852Born
19 Mar 187522.4Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc, Czech Republic
14 Nov 190452.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
14 Nov 190452.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Callipolis
18 Dec 190452.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Callipolis
18 Apr 192673.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Karel Wisnar
Bishop Karel Wisnar (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc

EventPlace
Birth PlacePribor

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 71
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 104

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast