Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Honiara

Archidioecesis Honiaranus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Adrian Thomas Smith, S.M., Archbishop
  • John Doaninoel, S.M., Auxiliary Bishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of English Solomon Islands
27 July 1897ErectedVicariate Apostolic of New Pomerania Prefecture Apostolic of English Solomon Islands (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Southern Solomon Islands
21 January 1904Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of English Solomon Islands Prefecture Apostolic of Southern Solomon Islands
Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Solomon Islands
1 June 1912ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Southern Solomon Islands Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Solomon Islands
11 June 1959Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Northern Solomon Islands
Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Solomon Islands
Vicariate Apostolic of Western Solomon Islands (erected)
Diocese of Honiara
15 November 1966ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Southern Solomon Islands Diocese of Honiara
Archdiocese of Honiara
15 November 1978ElevatedDiocese of Honiara Archdiocese of Honiara
17 December 1982Territory LostArchdiocese of Honiara Diocese of Auki (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Solomon Islands
195015,23488,00017.3%2222692314413ap1951
Diocese of Honiara
197028,075128,43921.9%54045623621237ap1971
Archdiocese of Honiara
198041,900214,00019.6%524291,4444410018ap1981
199033,345156,35921.3%517221,515367713ap1991
199938,936214,13918.2%919281,390366913ap2000
200032,083190,56316.8%1021311,034436413ap2001
200140,434183,25422.1%815231,758305613ap2002
200242,633196,63921.7%1319321,332265811ap2003
200343,826199,06022.0%1119301,460276313ap2004
200445,053204,63322.0%1523381,185316913ap2005
200647,762210,51422.7%1921401,194367513ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 17 Apr 2013