Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Taddeo Łubieński

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

Titular Bishop of Rhodiapolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1794BornGrabów
7 Sep 182328.9Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jan 184449.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
25 Jan 184449.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhodiapolis
18 Jun 184449.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhodiapolis
4 May 186166.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

MicroData Summary for Taddeo Łubieński:
Bishop Taddeo Łubieński (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

  • a priest for 37.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 323

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 4 Jan 2014