Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pawel Straszyński

Deceased

Bishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1784BornKrasnystaw
25 Jan 180722.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 Nov 183652.8AppointedBishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów, Poland
8 Jan 183752.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów, Poland
20 Jun 184763.4DiedBishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów, Poland

MicroData Summary for Pawel Straszyński
Bishop Pawel Straszyński (born , died ) Bishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów

  • a priest for 40.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,195
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 345
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1837, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Aug 2016