Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinando Elano Kahn, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tiraspol, Moldova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1788Born
24 May 181021.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
19 Dec 181426.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Preachers
13 Mar 181526.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
20 May 185061.7AppointedBishop of Cherson, Moldova
10 Nov 185062.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cherson, Moldova
18 Oct 186476.1DiedBishop of Tiraspol, Moldova

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando Elano Kahn
Bishop Ferdinando Elano Kahn O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Tiraspol

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGalizia Austriaca
Ordained BishopSainte Catherine, Saint Petersburg

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 556
  • ob/c34: CB, 15 Sep 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1850, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast