Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Valdeci Santos Mendes

Bishop of Brejo, Maranhão, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1961 Born
11 Dec 199433.2Ordained PriestPriest of Coroatá, Maranhão, Brazil
5 May 201048.6AppointedBishop of Brejo, Maranhão, Brazil
21 Aug 201048.9Ordained BishopBishop of Brejo, Maranhão, Brazil
28 Aug 201048.9InstalledBishop of Brejo, Maranhão, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Valdeci Santos Mendes
Bishop José Valdeci Santos Mendes (born ) Bishop of Brejo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoroatá

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Brejo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 May 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,775

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast