Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel María Pólit y Laso

Deceased

Archbishop of Quito


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1862BornQuito
22 Dec 189432.7Ordained PriestPriest of Quito, Ecuador
12 Jan 190744.7AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Ecuador
1 Nov 190745.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cuenca, Ecuador
7 Jun 191856.2AppointedArchbishop of Quito, Ecuador
30 Oct 193270.5DiedArchbishop of Quito, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Manuel María Pólit y Laso:
Archbishop Manuel María Pólit y Laso (born , died ) Archbishop of Quito

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015