Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan María Riera (Riesa), O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1866Born
10 Oct 188216.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
3 Aug 189024.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
5 Dec 190741.8AppointedBishop of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio), Ecuador
3 May 190842.2Ordained BishopBishop of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio), Ecuador
19 Jan 191245.9AppointedBishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
20 Nov 191549.8DiedBishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Juan María Riera (Riesa)
Bishop Juan María Riera (Riesa) O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Guayaquil

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmbato

  • a priest for 25.2 years
  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 190, and Page 310
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast