Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alejandro Pasquel Monge

Deceased

Bishop of Ibarra, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1869Born
1 Jan 189323.1Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 193162.1AppointedBishop of Ibarra, Ecuador
29 Jun 193262.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ibarra, Ecuador
18 Sep 193464.8DiedBishop of Ibarra, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Alejandro Pasquel Monge
Bishop Alejandro Pasquel Monge (born , died ) Bishop of Ibarra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIbarra

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,933
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,935
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,932, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast