Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicanor Roberto Aguirre Baus

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Loja

Titular Bishop of Lysinia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1887BornRiobamba
24 Sep 191023.7Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 193750.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Loja, Ecuador
16 Dec 193750.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippos
8 May 193851.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippos
23 Oct 194558.8AppointedBishop of Loja, Ecuador
10 Oct 195669.8ResignedBishop of Loja, Ecuador
10 Oct 195669.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Lysinia
13 Aug 197790.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Loja, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Nicanor Roberto Aguirre Baus:
Bishop Nicanor Roberto Aguirre Baus (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Loja

  • a priest for 66.9 years
  • a bishop for 39.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013