Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Barthélémy Djabla

Deceased

Archbishop of Gagnoa, Côte d’Ivoire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1936Born
15 Mar 196428.2Ordained PriestPriest of Gagnoa, Côte d’Ivoire
23 Oct 198953.8AppointedBishop of San Pedro-en-Côte d’Ivoire
7 Jan 199054.0Ordained BishopBishop of San Pedro-en-Côte d’Ivoire
21 Jul 200670.5AppointedArchbishop of Gagnoa, Côte d’Ivoire
24 Sep 200670.7InstalledArchbishop of Gagnoa, Côte d’Ivoire
15 Sep 200872.7DiedArchbishop of Gagnoa, Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Barthélémy Djabla
Archbishop Barthélémy Djabla (born 1936, died ) Archbishop of Gagnoa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMahibouo

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Jul 2006
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,956
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Feb 2017