Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paulin Kouabénan N`Gnamé

Deceased

Bishop of San Pedro-en-Côte d’Ivoire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1962BornMérékou
6 Aug 198927.2Ordained PriestPriest of Bondoukou, Côte d’Ivoire
1 Mar 200744.8AppointedBishop of San Pedro-en-Côte d’Ivoire
12 May 200745.0Ordained BishopBishop of San Pedro-en-Côte d’Ivoire
21 Mar 200845.9DiedBishop of San Pedro-en-Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Paulin Kouabénan N`Gnamé:
Bishop Paulin Kouabénan N`Gnamé (born , died ) Bishop of San Pedro-en-Côte d’Ivoire

  • a priest for 18.6 years
  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Mar 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,419
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013