Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspard Béby Gnéba

Bishop of Man


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1963 BornTehiri Guitry
12 Jul 199229.5Ordained PriestPriest of Gagnoa, Côte d’Ivoire
18 Dec 200744.9AppointedBishop of Man, Côte d’Ivoire
8 Mar 200845.2Ordained BishopBishop of Man, Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Gaspard Béby Gnéba:
Bishop Gaspard Béby Gnéba (born ) Bishop of Man

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Man.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Dec 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,687

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013