Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco René Revelo Contreras

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santa Ana, El Salvador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1923Born
17 Oct 194825.2Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jul 197350.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santa Ana, El Salvador
14 Jul 197350.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Germaniciana
8 Sep 197350.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germaniciana
Jan 197854.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Salvador, El Salvador
25 Feb 198157.6AppointedBishop of Santa Ana, El Salvador
19 Oct 199875.2RetiredBishop of Santa Ana, El Salvador
4 Sep 200077.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Santa Ana, El Salvador

MicroData Summary for Marco René Revelo Contreras
Bishop Marco René Revelo Contreras (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Santa Ana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Salvador

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast