Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Doumith

Deceased

Bishop of Sarba (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1915BornAin-el-Kharroubé
10 Mar 194024.6Ordained PriestPriest of Cipro (Maronite), Cyprus
21 Apr 195640.7SelectedBishop of Tyr (Maronite), Lebanon
4 May 195640.7ConfirmedBishop of Tyr (Maronite), Lebanon
29 Jun 195640.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tyr (Maronite), Lebanon
11 Dec 195944.3AppointedBishop of Sarba (Maronite), Lebanon
25 Feb 198973.5DiedBishop of Sarba (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Michael Doumith:
Bishop Michael Doumith (born , died ) Bishop of Sarba

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 20 Dec 2014