Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Vicente Díaz Bravo, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Durango, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1708³Born
27 Sep 176961.5SelectedBishop of Durango, México
20 Nov 176961.6ConfirmedBishop of Durango, México
3 Jun 177062.1Ordained BishopBishop of Durango, México
24 Apr 177264.0DiedBishop of Durango, México

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Vicente Díaz Bravo
Bishop José Vicente Díaz Bravo O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Durango

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTudela, Spain

  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 87, Number 441
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 23
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 202

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018