Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Gatti

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Greece

Titular Archbishop of Santa Giusta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1946 Born
29 Jun 197023.5Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jun 199851.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Santa Giusta
13 Jun 199851.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Malta
13 Jun 199851.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Libya
29 Aug 199851.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Santa Giusta
28 Jun 200154.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Lebanon
16 Jul 200962.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Greece
22 Feb 201164.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Greece

MicroData Summary for Luigi Gatti
Archbishop Luigi Gatti (born ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Greece

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastiglione Tinella, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Greece.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,375

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 30 Oct 2018

Quantcast