Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Devellerez Thaung Shwe

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pyay, Myanmar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1935Born
11 Jan 196125.2Ordained PriestPriest
2 Oct 197539.9AppointedBishop of Prome, Myanmar
2 Feb 197640.3Ordained BishopBishop of Prome, Myanmar
3 Dec 201075.1RetiredBishop of Pyay, Myanmar
17 Feb 201579.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Pyay, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Joseph Devellerez Thaung Shwe
Bishop Joseph Devellerez Thaung Shwe (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pyay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTwante

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 39.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2010
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • d: CB, 17 Feb 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast