Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marko Semren, O.F.M.

Auxiliary Bishop of Banja Luka, Bosnia and Herzegovina

Titular Bishop of Abaradira


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1954 Born
13 Apr 198025.9Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
29 Jun 198127.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
15 Jul 201056.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Banja Luka, Bosnia and Herzegovina
15 Jul 201056.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Abaradira
18 Sep 201056.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abaradira

MicroData Summary for Marko Semren
Bishop Marko Semren O.F.M. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Banja Luka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBila

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Banja Luka.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jul 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,795

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018