Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ivica Petanjak, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1963 Born
4 Oct 198825.0Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
24 Jun 199026.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
24 Jan 201551.4AppointedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
22 Mar 201551.5Ordained BishopBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Ivica Petanjak (VIAF: 305650835)
Bishop Ivica Petanjak O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop of Krk (Veglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDrenje

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Krk (Veglia).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Jan 2015
  • ob: CB, 27 Jan 2015
  • c2+: CB, 4 Feb 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,392

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 12 Nov 2018

Quantcast