Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrew Francis

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Multan, Pakistan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1946Born
10 Jan 197225.1Ordained PriestPriest
3 Dec 199953.0AppointedBishop of Multan, Pakistan
26 Feb 200053.2Ordained BishopBishop of Multan, Pakistan
13 Jun 201467.5ResignedBishop of Multan, Pakistan
6 Jun 201770.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Multan, Pakistan

MicroData Summary for Andrew Francis
Bishop Andrew Francis (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Multan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAdah
Death PlaceLahore

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,703
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Jun 2014
  • d: CB, 6 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Jun 2017