Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre de Broc

Deceased

Bishop of Auxerre


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1602BornCourtalain
7 Sep 163735.5SelectedBishop of Auxerre, France
19 Dec 163937.8ConfirmedBishop of Auxerre, France
4 Mar 164038.0Ordained BishopBishop of Auxerre, France
7 Jul 167169.3DiedBishop of Auxerre, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Broc:
Bishop Pierre de Broc (born , died ) Bishop of Auxerre

  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 87
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1640, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 26 Mar 2015