Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Camus de Poutcarré

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Sées


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1584BornBordeaux
17 Jan 161328.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Sées, France
17 Jan 161328.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Coronea
30 May 161430.3SucceededBishop of Sées, France
31 Aug 161430.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sées, France
4 Nov 165066.7DiedBishop of Sées, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques Camus de Poutcarré:
Bishop Jacques Camus de Poutcarré (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Sées

  • a bishop for 36.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 165, and Page 299
  • b/c2+: La France Pontificale, Volume 14, Page 62
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1614, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 3 Mar 2015