Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Joseph Biéchy, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Brazzaville, Congo

Titular Bishop of Thelepte


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1887Born
28 Oct 191225.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
27 Jan 193648.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Brazzaville, Congo
27 Jan 193648.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Thelepte
4 Jun 193648.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thelepte
18 Jul 195467.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Brazzaville, Congo
8 Jul 196073.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Brazzaville, Congo

MicroData Summary for Paul Joseph Biéchy
Bishop Paul Joseph Biéchy C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Brazzaville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHattstatt, France

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 19 Jul 2018

Quantcast