Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Song Sui-Wan, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of São Gabriel da Cachoeira, Amazonas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1941BornShanghai, China
17 Jul 197130.2Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
23 Jan 200260.7AppointedBishop of São Gabriel da Cachoeira, Amazonas, Brazil
27 Apr 200260.9Ordained BishopBishop of São Gabriel da Cachoeira, Amazonas, Brazil
4 Mar 200967.8ResignedBishop of São Gabriel da Cachoeira, Amazonas, Brazil
15 Nov 201271.5DiedBishop Emeritus of São Gabriel da Cachoeira, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Song Sui-Wan:
Bishop José Song Sui-Wan S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of São Gabriel da Cachoeira

  • a priest for 41.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Mar 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,180
  • d: CB, 15 Nov 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013