Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Tarcisio Filograna

Bishop of Nard˛-Gallipoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1952 BornLequile
29 Jun 197724.7Ordained PriestPriest of Lecce, Italy
16 Jul 201360.7AppointedBishop of Nard˛-Gallipoli, Italy
14 Sep 201360.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nard˛-Gallipoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Fernando Tarcisio Filograna:
Bishop Fernando Tarcisio Filograna (born ) Bishop of Nard˛-Gallipoli

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nard˛-Gallipoli.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2013
  • ob: CB, 16 Jul 2013
  • c2+: CB, 13 Sep 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,869

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015