Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Prudent de Becdelièvre

Deceased

Bishop of Nîmes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1705Born
11 Jun 172924.3Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 173732.3SelectedBishop of Nîmes, France
16 Dec 173732.8ConfirmedBishop of Nîmes, France
12 Jan 173832.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nîmes, France
23 Feb 178479.0DiedBishop of Nîmes, France

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Charles-Prudent de Becdelièvre
Bishop Charles-Prudent de Becdelièvre (born , died ) Bishop of Nîmes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNantes, Diocese of Nantes

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 46.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1738, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 305

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast