Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Jos

Archidioecesis Iosensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Ignatius Ayau Kaigama, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 26 March 1994
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Nigeria
  • Square Kilometers: 6,796 (2,624 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archjosnigeria.org/
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, P.O. Box 494, 20 Joseph D. Gomwalk Rd., Jos 930001, Plateau State, Nigeria
  • Telephone: (073)45.28.78
  • Fax: 45.15.47

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Jos
9 April 1934ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Northern Nigeria {Nigeria Settentrionale} Prefecture Apostolic of Jos (erected)
28 April 1942Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Dahomey
Vicariate Apostolic of Foumban
Prefecture Apostolic of Ghardaïa nel Sahara
Prefecture Apostolic of Jos
Prefecture Apostolic of Kaduna
Vicariate Apostolic of Khartoum
Vicariate Apostolic of Ouagadougou
Prefecture Apostolic of Niamey (erected)
14 July 1950Territory LostDiocese of Buéa
Prefecture Apostolic of Jos
Prefecture Apostolic of Oturkpo
Prefecture Apostolic of Yola (erected)
29 June 1953Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Jos Prefecture Apostolic of Maiduguri (erected)
Diocese of Jos
29 June 1953ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Jos Diocese of Jos
Archdiocese of Jos
26 March 1994ElevatedDiocese of Jos Archdiocese of Jos
10 July 1995Territory LostArchdiocese of Jos
Archdiocese of Kaduna
Diocese of Kafanchan (erected)
5 July 1996Territory LostArchdiocese of Jos Vicariate Apostolic of Bauchi (erected)
5 December 2000Territory LostArchdiocese of Jos
Diocese of Makurdi
Diocese of Lafia (erected)
2 June 2007Territory LostArchdiocese of Jos Diocese of Shendam (erected)
18 March 2014Territory LostArchdiocese of Jos
Diocese of Shendam
Diocese of Pankshin (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Jos
197067,5492,300,0002.9%52571096195718ap1971
1980170,0003,802,0004.5%2537622,74135245ap1981
1990450,0005,800,0007.8%5224765,9215679ap1991
Archdiocese of Jos
1999687,0002,863,40024.0%43145712,052336928ap2000
2000636,0002,560,00024.8%6714817,851276632ap2001
2001789,8223,037,78026.0%7812908,775278132ap2002
2002375,4703,128,91312.0%5714715,288308332ap2003
2003405,6953,222,78012.6%8213954,270295332ap2004
2004507,1643,107,22516.3%101151164,372336432ap2005
2006548,5733,263,27816.8%100141144,812736049ap2007
2007399,5222,228,46817.9%7212844,75626437bul2Jun07
2014360,0551,650,00021.8%48487,501165143bul:18Mar2014

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 14 Jun 2014