Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vicente da Soledade e Castro, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1763Born
5 Jan 178824.7ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
28 Aug 182057.4AppointedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
12 Nov 182057.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
31 Mar 182359.9DiedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Vicente da Soledade e Castro
Archbishop Vicente da Soledade e Castro O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePorto, Portugal

  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 331
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,820, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast