Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Arattukulam

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alleppey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1910BornArthunkal
29 Aug 193727.4Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jun 195242.2AppointedBishop of Alleppey, India
7 Dec 195242.6Ordained BishopBishop of Alleppey, India
28 Apr 198474.0RetiredBishop of Alleppey, India
20 Mar 199584.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Alleppey, India

MicroData Summary for Michael Arattukulam:
Bishop Michael Arattukulam (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alleppey

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 42.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 112

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013