Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luc Cyr

Archbishop of Sherbrooke, Québec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1953 BornSaint-Jérôme
29 Aug 198026.8Ordained PriestPriest of Saint-Jérôme, Québec, Canada
10 May 200147.5AppointedBishop of Valleyfield, Québec, Canada
17 Jun 200147.6Ordained BishopBishop of Valleyfield, Québec, Canada
26 Jul 201157.7AppointedArchbishop of Sherbrooke, Québec, Canada
29 Sep 201157.9InstalledArchbishop of Sherbrooke, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Luc Cyr:
Archbishop Luc Cyr (born ) Archbishop of Sherbrooke

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Sherbrooke.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Jul 2011
  • i: CB, 13 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,995

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013